Text: S.1845 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (12/18/2013)

Calendar No. 265

113th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. 1845

To provide for the extension of certain unemployment benefits, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
December 17, 2013

Mr. Reed (for himself, Mr. Heller, Mr. Leahy, Mr. Harkin, Mr. Murphy, Mr. Sanders, Ms. Stabenow, Mr. Markey, Mr. Durbin, Mrs. Murray, Mr. Franken, Ms. Baldwin, Ms. Klobuchar, and Mr. Wyden) introduced the following bill; which was read the first time

December 18, 2013

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


A BILL

To provide for the extension of certain unemployment benefits, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Emergency Unemployment Compensation Extension Act ”.

SEC. 2. Extension of emergency unemployment compensation program.

(a) Extension.—Section 4007(a)(2) of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended by striking “January 1, 2014” and inserting “April 1, 2014”.

(b) Funding.—Section 4004(e)(1) of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(1) in subparagraph (I), by striking “and” at the end;

(2) in subparagraph (J), by inserting “and” at the end; and

(3) by inserting after subparagraph (J) the following:

“(K) the amendments made by section 2(a) of the Emergency Unemployment Compensation Extension Act ;”.

(c) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall take effect as if included in the enactment of the American Taxpayer Relief Act of 2012 (Public Law 112–240).

SEC. 3. Temporary extension of extended benefit provisions.

(a) In general.—Section 2005 of the Assistance for Unemployed Workers and Struggling Families Act, as contained in Public Law 111–5 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note), is amended—

(1) by striking “December 31, 2013” each place it appears and inserting “March 31, 2014”; and

(2) in subsection (c), by striking “June 30, 2014” and inserting “September 30, 2014”.

(b) Extension of matching for states with no waiting week.—Section 5 of the Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2008 (Public Law 110–449; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended by striking “June 30, 2014” and inserting “September 30, 2014”.

(c) Extension of modification of indicators under the extended benefit program.—Section 203 of the Federal-State Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 1970 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(1) in subsection (d), by striking “December 31, 2013” and inserting “March 31, 2014”; and

(2) in subsection (f)(2), by striking “December 31, 2013” and inserting “March 31, 2014”.

(d) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall take effect as if included in the enactment of the American Taxpayer Relief Act of 2012 (Public Law 112–240).

SEC. 4. Extension of funding for reemployment services and reemployment and eligibility assessment activities.

(a) In general.—Section 4004(c)(2)(A) of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended by striking “through fiscal year 2014” and inserting “through the first quarter of fiscal year 2015”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall take effect as if included in the enactment of the American Taxpayer Relief Act of 2012 (Public Law 112–240).

SEC. 5. Additional extended unemployment benefits under the railroad unemployment insurance act.

(a) Extension.—Section 2(c)(2)(D)(iii) of the Railroad Unemployment Insurance Act (45 U.S.C. 352(c)(2)(D)(iii)) is amended—

(1) by striking “June 30, 2013” and inserting “September 30, 2013”; and

(2) by striking “December 31, 2013” and inserting “March 31, 2014”.

(b) Clarification on authority To use funds.—Funds appropriated under either the first or second sentence of clause (iv) of section 2(c)(2)(D) of the Railroad Unemployment Insurance Act shall be available to cover the cost of additional extended unemployment benefits provided under such section 2(c)(2)(D) by reason of the amendments made by subsection (a) as well as to cover the cost of such benefits provided under such section 2(c)(2)(D), as in effect on the day before the date of enactment of this Act.

(c) Funding for administration.—Out of any funds in the Treasury not otherwise appropriated, there are appropriated to the Railroad Retirement Board $62,500 for administrative expenses associated with the payment of additional extended unemployment benefits provided under section 2(c)(2)(D) of the Railroad Unemployment Insurance Act by reason of the amendments made by subsection (a), to remain available until expended.

SEC. 6. Flexibility for unemployment program agreements.

(a) Flexibility.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Subsection (g) of section 4001 of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) shall not apply with respect to a State that has enacted a law before December 1, 2013, that, upon taking effect, would violate such subsection.

(2) EFFECTIVE DATE.—Paragraph (1) is effective with respect to weeks of unemployment beginning on or after December 29, 2013.

(b) Permitting a subsequent agreement.—Nothing in such title IV shall preclude a State whose agreement under such title was terminated from entering into a subsequent agreement under such title on or after the date of the enactment of this Act if the State, taking into account the application of subsection (a), would otherwise meet the requirements for an agreement under such title.


Calendar No. 265

113th CONGRESS
     1st Session
S. 1845

A BILL
To provide for the extension of certain unemployment benefits, and for other purposes.

December 18, 2013
Read the second time and placed on the calendar