Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 12/18/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 12/19/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 12/20/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 12/20/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 01/08/2014
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 01/08/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 01/09/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/14/2014