Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 01/30/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/27/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/17/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/09/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/09/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/09/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/09/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/09/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/09/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/09/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/09/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/09/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/09/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/09/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/09/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/09/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/09/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/09/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/09/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/09/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/09/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/09/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/09/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/09/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 05/09/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 05/09/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/09/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/09/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 05/09/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/09/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/09/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/09/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/09/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/09/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/09/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/09/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/09/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/09/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/09/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/09/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/09/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/09/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/09/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/09/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/09/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/09/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/09/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/09/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/09/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/09/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/09/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/09/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/09/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/09/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/09/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/09/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/09/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/09/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 05/09/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/09/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/09/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/09/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/09/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/09/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/09/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/09/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 05/09/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/09/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 05/09/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/13/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/03/2013