Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/07/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 01/07/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/07/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/07/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 01/07/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 01/07/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/07/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 01/07/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 01/07/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 01/07/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/07/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 01/07/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/08/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/08/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 01/08/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/13/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 01/15/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 01/15/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/29/2014