Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 12/19/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/20/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 12/20/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 12/20/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 12/20/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 12/20/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 12/20/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 12/20/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 01/06/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 01/06/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 01/06/2014
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 01/06/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/06/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 01/06/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 01/06/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/06/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/06/2014
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 01/06/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 01/06/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 01/06/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 01/06/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/06/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 01/08/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 01/08/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 01/08/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 01/08/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 01/08/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 01/08/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/09/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/09/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 01/09/2014
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 01/09/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 01/09/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 04/30/2014