Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 01/13/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 01/13/2014
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 01/13/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/14/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 01/14/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/14/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/14/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 01/15/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 01/15/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/15/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 01/15/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 01/16/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 01/16/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/16/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 01/27/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/28/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/06/2014