Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 01/09/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 01/13/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 01/13/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 01/13/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 01/13/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 01/15/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 01/15/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 01/27/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 01/30/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/25/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/25/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/11/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/11/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/14/2014