Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/09/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/15/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/16/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 01/29/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 01/30/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 01/30/2014
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 02/04/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/22/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 05/22/2014