Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 02/04/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/11/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/05/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/19/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 12/19/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 03/05/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/06/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/06/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/11/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/11/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/24/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/31/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 03/31/2014