Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/27/2014
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 01/28/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 01/30/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 02/24/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 02/24/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/27/2014
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 04/01/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/07/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/10/2014