Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/14/2014
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/14/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 01/30/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/06/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/06/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 02/06/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/27/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 04/08/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/29/2014