Refine your search

44 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
01/31/2014-3:22pm House Held at the desk.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/31/2014-3:03pm House Received in the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/30/2014 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/30/2014 Senate Passed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 67 - 32. Record Vote Number: 19. (text: CR S619-626)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/30/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2700 Amendment SA 2700 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 50. Record Vote Number: 18.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/30/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2709 Proposed amendment SA 2709 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S618)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/30/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2697 Amendment SA 2697 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 24 - 75. Record Vote Number: 17.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/30/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2707 Amendment SA 2707 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 34 - 65. Record Vote Number: 16.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/30/2014 Senate Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S613-619, S619-627)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/30/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2697 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S613, S617-618)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/30/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2709 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S613)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/30/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2707 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S613, S615-617)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/30/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2700 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S613, S618)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2708 Amendment SA 2708 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2706 Amendment SA 2706 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2703 Amendment SA 2703 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate Motion to waive all applicable budgetary discipline with respect to the measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 64 - 35. Record Vote Number: 15.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2709 Amendment SA 2709 proposed by Senator Merkley. (consideration: CR S579; text as modified: CR S579)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2707 Amendment SA 2707 proposed by Senator Toomey. (consideration: CR S577-579, S579-581; text as modified: CR S577-579)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2703 Amendment SA 2703 proposed by Senator Reed. (consideration: CR S574-577, S588; text: CR S574)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate Motion to waive all applicable budgetary discipline with respect to the measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S573, S588)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate Point of order that the measure violates the Congressional Budget Act raised in Senate.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2697 Amendment SA 2697 proposed by Senator Coburn. (consideration: CR S573-574, S581, S588; text: CR S573)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2706 Amendment SA 2706 proposed by Senator Whitehouse. (consideration: CR S571-573, S588; text: CR S571)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2700 Amendment SA 2700 proposed by Senator Heller. (consideration: CR S568-569; text: CR S565-569)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2708 Amendment SA 2708 proposed by Senator Gillibrand. (consideration: CR S566-568, S588-589; text: CR S566)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2698 Amendment SA 2698 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2705 Amendment SA 2705 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2704 Amendment SA 2704 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2702 Amendment SA 2702 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2698 Amendment SA 2698 proposed by Senator Blunt. (consideration: CR S565-566; text: CR S566)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2705 Amendment SA 2705 proposed by Senator King. (consideration: CR S565-566; text: CR S566)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2704 Amendment SA 2704 proposed by Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S565-566; text: CR S565-566)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2702 Amendment SA 2702 proposed by Senator Hagan. (consideration: CR S565-566; text: CR S565)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S565-593)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/29/2014 Senate Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S565)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/28/2014 Senate Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S495-505, S505-516)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/27/2014 Senate Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 86 - 13. Record Vote Number: 14. (consideration: CR S478-479)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/27/2014 Senate Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S467-481)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the bill presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S432; text: CR S432)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/16/2014 Senate Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S383-385, S425-432)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/15/2014 Senate Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 294.
Type of Action: Calendars
01/14/2014 Senate Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Type of Action: Calendars