Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/16/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 01/16/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 01/16/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/30/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/10/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/05/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/24/2014