Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 01/16/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 01/16/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/16/2014
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/16/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 01/27/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/04/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/10/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 05/14/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/22/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 11/13/2014