Refine your search

Showing 10 of 10 total for All Actions.
Date All Actions
02/12/2014 Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 298.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
02/11/2014 Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S860-871, S872-873, S873-885)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
02/10/2014 Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 94 - 0. Record Vote Number: 26. (consideration: CR S846-847; text: CR S846-847)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
02/10/2014 Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S837, S838, S842, S845-847)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
02/06/2014 Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S812; text: CR S812)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
02/06/2014 Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S775, S812)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
02/04/2014 Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S738-739, S747-750, S754-755)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
01/28/2014 Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 298.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
01/27/2014 Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
01/27/2014 Introduced in Senate
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate