There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the East Bench Irrigation District Water Contract Extension Act to permit the Secretary of the Interior to extend the contract for certain water services.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/31/2014Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Landrieu without amendment. With written report No. 113-228.
01/28/2014Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
07/31/2014Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 515.
Action By: Senate
07/31/2014Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Landrieu without amendment. With written report No. 113-228.
06/18/2014Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/27/2014Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-284.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
01/28/2014Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/28/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 06/03/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/28/2014 Referred to
06/18/2014 Markup by
07/31/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-228
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power02/27/2014 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1965. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (07/31/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the East Bench Irrigation District Water Contract Extension Act to permit the Secretary of the Interior to extend the contract for water services between the United States and the East Bench Irrigation District until the earlier of: (1) that date that is 10 years (currently, 4 years) after the date on which the contract would have expired if such Act had not been enacted, or (2) the date on which a new long-term contract is executed by the parties to the contract.