Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/06/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/12/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/12/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 02/25/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/01/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 07/23/2014