Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 02/06/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/12/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/01/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/01/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 04/29/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/29/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/29/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/06/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/06/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/06/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/13/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/14/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 05/21/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/03/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/04/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/12/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 06/12/2014