Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 02/10/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 02/12/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 04/29/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/12/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/20/2014