There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Veterans Affairs Management Accountability Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the removal of Senior Executive Service employees of the Department of Veterans Affairs for performance, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/11/2014Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
02/11/2014Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/04/2014
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/04/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/13/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/02/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/03/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 04/08/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/28/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/29/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/29/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 04/30/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/06/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/12/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/12/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/13/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/14/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/20/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/21/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/21/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/21/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/21/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/21/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/22/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/22/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 05/22/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/22/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/02/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/02/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 06/02/2014
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 06/02/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/02/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/02/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 06/02/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/02/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/02/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/02/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/02/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/02/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/02/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/03/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/03/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/03/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 06/03/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/03/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 06/03/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/04/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/04/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/04/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/04/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/04/2014
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/04/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/04/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/04/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/15/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs02/11/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2013. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/11/2014)

Department of Veterans Affairs Management Accountability Act of 2014 - Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to: (1) remove any employee of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) from a Senior Executive Service position upon determining such individual's performance warrants removal, and (2) remove such individual from the civil service or appoint the individual to a General Schedule position at any grade that the Secretary deems appropriate.

Requires: (1) the Secretary to notify the House and Senate Veterans' Affairs committees within 30 days after removing such an individual, and (2) such removal to be done in the same manner as the removal of a professional staff member employed by a Member of Congress.