Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/04/2014
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/04/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/13/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/02/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/03/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 04/08/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/28/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/29/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/29/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 04/30/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/06/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/12/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/12/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/13/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/14/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/20/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/21/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/21/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/21/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/21/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/21/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/22/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/22/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 05/22/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/22/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/02/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/02/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 06/02/2014
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 06/02/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/02/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/02/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/02/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/02/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/02/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/02/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/02/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/02/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/02/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/03/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/03/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/03/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 06/03/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/03/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 06/03/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/04/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/04/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/04/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/04/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/04/2014
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/04/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/04/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/04/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/15/2014