Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 02/12/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/24/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/24/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/26/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/26/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/11/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/11/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/12/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/24/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/30/2014