Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 02/14/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/07/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/06/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/12/2013
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/12/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/12/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/12/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/12/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 06/12/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/12/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/12/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/12/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/31/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 08/01/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/25/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/30/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/29/2013