Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/31/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/04/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/08/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/16/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/30/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/20/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/20/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 12/12/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 12/12/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 12/12/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 01/14/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 01/27/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 01/27/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 01/27/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/24/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/24/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/24/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/29/2014