Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/26/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/26/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/26/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 02/26/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/26/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/10/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/10/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/20/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/10/2014