Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 02/27/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 02/27/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 02/27/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT]* 02/27/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 02/27/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/27/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/05/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 03/11/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/13/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/13/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/27/2014
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 03/27/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/27/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/18/2014