Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/04/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/26/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/26/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/26/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/27/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 04/01/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/01/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/28/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/30/2014