Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 03/05/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/12/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/13/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/13/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/24/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/25/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/25/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/26/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 04/10/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/14/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/20/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/19/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/29/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/30/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 07/31/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/17/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/17/2014