Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/10/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 04/10/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/11/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 08/01/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/08/2014