Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 03/11/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/11/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/24/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/24/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/26/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/31/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/01/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/01/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/08/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/10/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/05/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/05/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 06/05/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/19/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/19/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/15/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 07/23/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 09/15/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/18/2014