Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/12/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 03/12/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/12/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/12/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 03/12/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 03/12/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/12/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/12/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 03/12/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/24/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/24/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/30/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/17/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/19/2014