Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/25/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/26/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/31/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/07/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/07/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 04/11/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/29/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/29/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/21/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 06/04/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/13/2014