Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/25/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 04/07/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/13/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/19/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/30/2014