Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
11/26/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-195.
11/26/2014 Signed by President.
11/19/2014 Presented to President.
11/13/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H7959-7964)
09/17/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5715-5720; text as passed Senate: CR S5715-5720)
09/17/2014 Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/13/2014 Introduced in Senate