Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/07/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/08/2014
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/11/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 04/11/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 04/29/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/08/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/08/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/21/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/21/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/02/2014
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 06/24/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 07/08/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/29/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/31/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/17/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/17/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/17/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 09/17/2014