Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/07/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/08/2014
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/11/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/21/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/02/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/29/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/31/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/17/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 09/17/2014