Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/13/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 04/11/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 04/29/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/08/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/08/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/21/2014
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 06/24/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 07/08/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/17/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/17/2014