Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/25/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/06/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/12/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/21/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 06/16/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/14/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/22/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/23/2014