Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 03/25/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/07/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/07/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/09/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/20/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/22/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/07/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/16/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/17/2014
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 09/09/2014