Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 02/12/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/25/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/04/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/07/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/18/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/11/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/14/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/12/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/17/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 01/09/2014