Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/27/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/27/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 03/27/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/27/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 03/27/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 03/27/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/27/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 04/01/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 05/22/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/11/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/08/2014