Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/04/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/07/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/07/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 02/14/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 03/04/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 03/12/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/13/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/22/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 04/17/2013