Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/27/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/31/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/02/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/10/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/29/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/01/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/07/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/22/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/10/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/16/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/17/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/28/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/29/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/31/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/15/2014