There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Act of June 18, 1934, to reaffirm the authority of the Secretary of the Interior to take land into trust for Indian tribes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
08/26/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2014 with an amendment. Without written report.
03/31/2014Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
08/26/2014Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 540.
Action By: Senate
08/26/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2014 with an amendment. Without written report.
06/11/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
05/07/2014Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-509.
03/31/2014Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1873)
Action By: Senate
03/31/2014Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1872-1873)
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs03/31/2014 Referred to
05/07/2014 Hearings by
06/11/2014 Markup by
08/26/2014 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2188. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (08/26/2014)

Amends the Indian Reorganization Act to apply the Act to all federally recognized Indian tribes, regardless of when the tribe became recognized. (This effectively overrules the Supreme Court's decision in Carcieri v. Salazar, which held that the Secretary of the Interior could not take land into trust for a specified tribe because that tribe had not been federally recognized when the Act was enacted in 1934.) Ratifies and confirms any action taken by the Secretary pursuant to the Act for any Indian tribe that was federally recognized on the date of the action.

Directs the Secretary to report to Congress on the effects of Carcieri v. Salazar on Indian tribes and tribal land. Requires the Secretary to publish a list of each Indian tribe and parcel of tribal land affected by that decision in the Federal Register and on the Department of the Interior's website.