There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Let Me Google That For You Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to streamline the collection and distribution of government information.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/03/2014Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
04/03/2014Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 04/03/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 05/12/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 05/12/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 06/23/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 07/08/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 12/09/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation04/03/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2206. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/03/2014)

Let Me Google That For You Act - Repeals the National Technical Information Act of 1988, effective one year after the enactment of this Act (thus abolishes the National Technical Information Service [NTIS]).

Directs: (1) the Secretary of Commerce, the Archivist of the United States, the Comptroller General (GAO), and the Commissioner of Social Security to consult with the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to determine if any NTIS function is critical to the U.S. economy; (2) the Comptroller General to determine which of any such critical functions are not being carried out by any other agency or instrumentality of the federal government; and (3) the Secretary of Commerce, prior to the effective date of this Act, to submit to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce and the Senate Committee on Finance a written certification that all NTIS operations have been terminated.