There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Minimum Wage Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for an increase in the Federal minimum wage and to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend increased expensing limitations and the treatment of certain real property as section 179 property.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/08/2014Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date
04/30/2014Motion by Senator Reid to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to the measure (Record Vote No. 117) entered in Senate. (consideration: CR S2527-2528, S2535-2543, S2543-2546, S2546-2547, S2548-2549)
Action By: Senate
04/30/2014Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 42. Record Vote Number: 117. (consideration: CR S2545-2546; text: CR S2545)
Action By: Senate
04/30/2014Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
Action By: Senate
04/29/2014Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2427-2428, S2435-2441, S2453-2457, S2457-2462)
Action By: Senate
04/28/2014Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S2409; text: CR S2409)
Action By: Senate
04/28/2014Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2409-2410, S2419-2420)
Action By: Senate
04/10/2014Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2333, S2334)
Action By: Senate
04/09/2014Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 354.
Action By: Senate
04/08/2014Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/08/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/08/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/09/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 04/09/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 04/09/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 04/09/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/09/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/09/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/09/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 04/09/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/09/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/09/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 04/09/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 04/09/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/09/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/09/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 04/09/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/09/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 04/09/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/09/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 04/09/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/10/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/10/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/10/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/10/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/10/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 04/10/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 04/10/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/10/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/10/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/10/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/10/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/10/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/10/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/28/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/28/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/28/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/01/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/09/2014

Committees (0)

As of 05/22/2019 text has not been received for S.2223 - Minimum Wage Fairness Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2223. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/08/2014)

Minimum Wage Fairness Act - Amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 (FLSA) to increase the federal minimum wage for employees to: (1) $8.20 an hour beginning on the first day of the sixth month after the enactment of this Act, (2) $9.15 an hour beginning one year after the date of such initial increase, (3) $10.10 an hour beginning two years after such date, and (4) the amount determined by the Secretary of Labor (based on increases in the Consumer Price Index) beginning three years after such date and annually thereafter.

Increases the federal minimum wage for tipped employees to $3.00 an hour for one year beginning on the first day of the sixth month after the enactment of this Act. Provides a formula for subsequent annual adjustments of the minimum wage for tipped employees until it equals 70% of the wage in effect under FLSA for other employees.

Directs the Secretary of Labor, 60 days before any increase in the minimum wage, to publish it in the Federal Register and on the Department of Labor's website.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through taxable years beginning before 2017: (1) the increase to $500,000 of the expensing allowance for business assets, including computer software; and (2) the treatment of qualified real property (i.e., leasehold improvement property, restaurant property, and retail improvement property) as depreciable business property.