Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/08/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/08/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/09/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 04/09/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 04/09/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 04/09/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 04/09/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/09/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/09/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 04/09/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/09/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/09/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 04/09/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 04/09/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/09/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/09/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 04/09/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/09/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 04/09/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/09/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 04/09/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/10/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/10/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/10/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/10/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/10/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/10/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 04/10/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/10/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/10/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/10/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/10/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/10/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/10/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/28/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/28/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/28/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/01/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/09/2014