Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/09/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 04/30/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/06/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/22/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 07/09/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/10/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/08/2014