Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 04/30/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/09/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/09/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/09/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/09/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/10/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/10/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/28/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/28/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/28/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/28/2014
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 07/28/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/31/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/15/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/18/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/18/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/17/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/18/2014