Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 04/10/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/11/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/29/2014
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/30/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/01/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/01/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/09/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/14/2014